Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Susan Cope, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by 12 Honey Hill Road, Hassett & George Pc, against Robert J. Cope, represented by 62-1 Still Lane, Gould Larson Bennet Mcdonnell Quilliam &, in the jurisdiction of New London County, CT, . New London County, CT Superior Courts with HON KAREN GOODROW presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON KAREN GOODROW Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2022 |
CategoryF00 - Family - Dissolution Of Marriage - C.G.S. Chapter 815J |
Last RefreshedMarch 08, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNew London County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF FINAL AGREEMENT ON MOTION(S) (FORM JD-FM-280) | |
March 07, 2024 | Case Date | ||
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF FINAL AGREEMENT WITHOUT COURT APPEARANCE (FORM JD-FM-282) | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF FINAL AGREEMENT ON MOTION(S) (FORM JD-FM-280) | |
February 29, 2024 | Case Date | ||
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/9/2024 HON SUSAN CONNORS | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR REFERRAL BY CSSD FAMILY SERVICES (FORM JD-FM-230) | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/4/2023 HON SUSAN CONNORS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.