Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tanisha Johnson, filed a(n) case represented by 18 Hawthorne Drive, against Akiva C Epps, in the jurisdiction of New London County, CT, . New London County, CT Superior Courts with HON KAREN GOODROW presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON KAREN GOODROW Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew London County, CT |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL RESULT: HON KAREN GOODROW | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 3/24/2022 HON KAREN GOODROW | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF RESOLUTION SCREENING (FORM JD-FM-290) | |
March 23, 2022 | Resolution Plan Date | ||
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WAIVE ENTRY FEE AND PAY COSTS OF SERVICE RESULT: Granted 2/14/2022 HON KAREN GOODROW | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR PENDENTE LITE ORDERS INCLUDING CUSTODY | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION - PUBLIC ASSISTANCE | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.