Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Shiquel R Pires-Dunn, filed a(n) case represented by 980 Bank Street, against Ashley E Falzone, in the jurisdiction of New London County, CT, . New London County, CT Superior Courts with Karen A. Goodrow presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKaren A. Goodrow Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew London County, CT |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2022 | Resolution Plan Date | ||
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 3/1/2022 HON KAREN GOODROW | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL RESULT: HON KAREN GOODROW | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 1/28/2022 HON KAREN GOODROW | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PARTY PARTICIPATION IN PARENTING EDUCATION PROGRAM CGS SEC 46B-69B | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WAIVE ENTRY FEE AND PAY COSTS OF SERVICE | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION - PUBLIC ASSISTANCE | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC COURT ORDERS (JD-FM-158) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.