Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Nakisha Rivera, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by 128 Sandy Lane, against Andrew M Moreau, represented by 3 Sylvian Street, Kevin Davis Wickless, in the jurisdiction of New London County, CT, . New London County, CT Superior Courts with HON KAREN GOODROW presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON KAREN GOODROW Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2022 |
CategoryF40 - Family - Custody Application - C.G.S. 46B-61 |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNew London County, CT |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 12/15/2022 HON CECIL THOMAS | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT RESULT: Order 12/15/2022 HON CECIL THOMAS | |
December 15, 2022 | Hearing | ||
November 04, 2022 | Hearing | ||
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/2/2022 HON CECIL THOMAS | |
November 02, 2022 | Hearing | ||
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF RESOLUTION SCREENING (FORM JD-FM-290) | |
September 14, 2022 | Resolution Plan Date | ||
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT RESULT: Order 8/16/2022 HON CECIL THOMAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.