Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Amber Oneill, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Abel Gonzalez, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, CT, . Middlesex County, CT Superior Courts with FREDERIC GILMAN, FSM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFREDERIC GILMAN, FSM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2020 |
CategoryF85 - Family - Support Petition - C.G.S. 46B-215 |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, CT |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CLOSURE OF IV-D CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO NONAPPEARING OBLIGOR Notice to Nonappearing Obligor | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF SUPPORT RESULT: FREDERIC GILMAN, FSM | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT MAGISTRATE - JD-FM-170 RESULT: Order 1/21/2021 FREDERIC GILMAN, FSM | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | WORKSHEET FOR THE CONNECTICUT CHILD SUPPORT AND ARREARAGE GUIDELINES CCSG-1 | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC ORDERS - PETITION FOR CHILD SUPPORT (JD-FM-210) | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SUPPORT | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.