Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jalissa N. Ramos, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by 2 Mcdonald Ave., against Keith A. Easter, represented by 77A Miller Street, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, CT, . Middlesex County, CT Superior Courts with HON MARK GOULD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON MARK GOULD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2013 |
CategoryF40 - Family - Custody Application - C.G.S. 46B-61 |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, CT |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL-GENERAL RESULT: HON MARK GOULD | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER RESULT: Order 1/27/2014 HON MARK GOULD | |
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WAIVE ENTRY FEE AND PAY COSTS OF SERVICE RESULT: Granted 1/22/2014 HON EDWARD DOMNARSKI | |
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION TO COURT OF PARENTING EDUCATION PROGRAM RESULTS BY FAM DIV CGS SEC. 46b-69b(c) | |
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT RESULT: Order 11/18/2013 HON BARBARA QUINN | |
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | WORKSHEET FOR THE CONNECTICUT CHILD SUPPORT AND ARREARAGE GUIDELINES CCSG-1 | |
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT DATE | |
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CUSTODY APPLICATION RESULT: Order 11/18/2013 HON BARBARA QUINN Last Updated: Result Information - 11/20/2013 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.