Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Kyle Ruberg, filed a(n) T90 - Torts - All Other case represented by Cantor Injury Law Firm Llc, against Higganum Pharmacy, Llc, represented by Musco & Iassogna, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, CT, . Middlesex County, CT Superior Courts with Rupal Shah presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRupal Shah Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 09, 2023 |
CategoryT90 - Torts - All Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, CT |
|
This complaint is filed by Kyle Ruberg against Higganum Pharmacy, LLC. Kyle Ruberg, a resident of the Town of Clinton, Connecticut, was employed by Higganum Pharmacy from November 1, 2021, until his wrongful termination on January 28, 2022. On Novemb...
WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION
Date: September 06, 2023ORDER RESULT: Accepted 8/22/2023 HON RUPAL SHAH
Date: August 22, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Accepted 8/22/2023 HON RUPAL SHAH
Date: August 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2024 | Trial | ||
October 07, 2024 | Trial Management Conference | ||
September 04, 2024 | Pretrial Conference | ||
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION RESULT: BY THE PLAINTIFF | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Accepted 8/22/2023 HON RUPAL SHAH | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Accepted 8/22/2023 HON RUPAL SHAH | |
August 21, 2023 | Conference | ||
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/20/2023 HON RUPAL SHAH | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 6/20/2023 HON RUPAL SHAH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.