Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Kendyl D. Ortiz, Nicolas A. Ortiz, filed a(n) T90 - Torts - All Other case represented by Mccabe Wikstrom & Barney Llc, against Town Of Haddam, represented by Howd & Ludorf Llc, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, CT, . Middlesex County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Edward S. Domnarski presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEdward S. Domnarski Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 04, 2023 |
CategoryT90 - Torts - All Other |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, CT |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Kendyl D. Ortiz and Nicolas A. Ortiz against the Town of Haddam. The plaintiffs were owners of property at 35 Haddam View Heights in Haddam, Connecticut. The defendant, Town of Haddam, manages and maintains the public road ...
SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: January 26, 2024SCHEDULING ORDER Corrected RESULT: Accepted 2/1/2024 HON EDWARD DOMNARSKI
Date: January 26, 2024MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Denied 1/18/2024 HON EDWARD DOMNARSKI
Date: January 11, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/11/2023 HON EDWARD DOMNARSKI
Date: December 11, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/9/2024 HON EDWARD DOMNARSKI
Date: January 09, 2024ORDER RESULT: Accepted 2/1/2024 HON EDWARD DOMNARSKI
Date: February 01, 2024CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: May 12, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE DISCOVERY MOTION OR REQUEST PB CH13
Date: September 28, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/30/2023 HON EDWARD DOMNARSKI
Date: October 30, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/13/2023 HON EDWARD DOMNARSKI
Date: November 13, 2023REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: May 12, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Accepted 6/27/2023 HON EDWARD DOMNARSKI
Date: June 27, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 04, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 04, 2023ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: May 11, 2023ORDER re: scheduling order RESULT: Denied 1/18/2024 HON EDWARD DOMNARSKI
Date: January 18, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/21/2023 HON EDWARD DOMNARSKI
Date: August 21, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: April 04, 2023SUMMONS
Date: April 04, 2023ORDER RESULT: Accepted 6/27/2023 HON EDWARD DOMNARSKI
Date: June 27, 2023CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: May 11, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/20/2023 HON EDWARD DOMNARSKI
Date: September 20, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: September 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
December 03, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
November 19, 2024 | Remote Trial Management Conference | ||
September 24, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 10, 2024 | Trial Management Conference | ||
June 04, 2024 | Remote Pretrial Conference | ||
April 01, 2024 | Remote Pretrial Conference | ||
February 05, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-12 #006 | ||
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Accepted 2/1/2024 HON EDWARD DOMNARSKI | |
January 31, 2024 | Remote Pretrial Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.