Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by London & London, against Michael L Farmer, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, CT, . Middlesex County, CT Superior Courts with Julia L. Aurigemma presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulia L. Aurigemma Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2018 |
CategoryC40 - Contracts - Collections |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION-WAGES (JD-CV-3)
Date: June 11, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: July 16, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | EXECUTION ISSUED - WAGES | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION-WAGES (JD-CV-3) | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | EXECUTION RETURNED | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | EXECUTION ISSUED | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION FINANCIAL INSTITUTION-DEBTOR IS A NATURAL PERSON (JD-CV-24) | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | EXECUTION RETURNED | |
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | EXECUTION ISSUED - WAGES | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION-WAGES (JD-CV-3) | |
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED | |
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/29/2018 HON JULIA AURIGEMMA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.