Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by London & London, against Tammy Jenislawski A K A Tammy M Jenislawski, represented by 52 Eli Chapman Rd, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, CT, . Middlesex County, CT Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2018 |
CategoryS15 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Collection - Purchase Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION-WAGES (JD-CV-3)
Date: February 13, 2020ORDER RESULT: Order 7/16/2018 ANTHONY DIPENTIMA, MAG
Date: July 16, 2018SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40
Date: May 23, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - SMALL CLAIMS | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | EXECUTION ISSUED - WAGES | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION-WAGES (JD-CV-3) | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | EXECUTION RETURNED | |
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | EXECUTION ISSUED | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION FINANCIAL INSTITUTION-DEBTOR IS A NATURAL PERSON (JD-CV-24) | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 7/16/2018 ANTHONY DIPENTIMA, MAG | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL-GENERAL RESULT: ANTHONY DIPENTIMA, MAG | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40 | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.