Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
American Eagle Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Cohn Birnbaum & Shea Pc, against 1306 Post Road, Llc, 1935 Post Road, Llc, American Eagle Federal Credit Union, Gunar M. Murtishi, Joseph A. Barbieri, (total of 5) See All represented by Cloutier & Cassella Llc, Cohn Birnbaum & Shea Pc, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, CT, . Middlesex County, CT Superior Courts with Julia L. Aurigemma presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulia L. Aurigemma Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2014 |
CategoryP00 - Property - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, CT |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/28/2014 HON SHELLEY MARCUS
Date: April 28, 2014PROPOSED ORDER OF LAW DAYS
Date: May 30, 2014PRELIMINARY STATEMENT OF DEBT
Date: June 04, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO JUDGMENT OF STRICT FORECLOSURE | |
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 6/17/2014 HON JULIA AURIGEMMA | |
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF STRICT FORECLOSURE RESULT: HON JULIA AURIGEMMA | |
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT IN PART - GENERAL CASE REMAINS PENDING | |
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT RE: ATTORNEY/COUNSEL FEES | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE WORKSHEET JD-CV-77 | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FEDERAL LOSS MITIGATION PROGRAMS (JD-CL-114) | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH EMAP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.