Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Constance Posse, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Dolan Divorce Lawyers Pllc, against Carl Posse Iii, represented by Miller & Lubonja Llc, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with Andrew W. Roraback presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrew W. Roraback Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2023 |
CategoryF40 - Family - Custody Application - C.G.S. 46B-61 |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2023 | Remote Status Conference | ||
October 20, 2023 | Remote Resolution Plan Date | ||
August 31, 2023 | Remote Status Conference | ||
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 7/10/2023 HON ANDREW RORABACK | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/10/2023 HON ANDREW RORABACK | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/3/2023 HON ANDREW RORABACK | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR REFERRAL BY CSSD FAMILY SERVICES (FORM JD-FM-230) RESULT: Granted 5/3/2023 HON ANDREW RORABACK | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF RESOLUTION SCREENING (FORM JD-FM-290) | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-LONG | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.