Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ronald E. Reiske Jr, filed a(n) F40 - Family - Custody Application - C.G.S. 46B-61 case represented by 285 Shakers Rd, 900 Highland Ave, against Meghan R. Smerigilo, represented by 40 N. Pleasant Rise, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with Ann E. Lynch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnn E. Lynch Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 21, 2023 |
CategoryF40 - Family - Custody Application - C.G.S. 46B-61 |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE M. Smerigilo | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER - FAMILY MATTERS RESULT: Order 5/11/2023 HON ANDREW RORABACK | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF RESOLUTION SCREENING (FORM JD-FM-290) | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA BY SELF-REP PARTY - PB SEC 7-19 RESULT: Denied 5/4/2023 HON ANDREW RORABACK | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WAIVE ENTRY FEE AND PAY COSTS OF SERVICE RESULT: Denied 5/4/2023 HON ANDREW RORABACK | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE D Last Updated: Additional Description - 05/04/2023 | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.