Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Heather L. Frasca, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by 24 Cottage Street, Seabourne Malley & Turner, against James M. Frasca, represented by 87 Elm St #1, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Andrew W. Roraback presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrew W. Roraback Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2023 |
CategoryF00 - Family - Dissolution Of Marriage - C.G.S. Chapter 815J |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-LONG | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | SEPARATION AGREEMENT | |
March 05, 2024 | Trial | ||
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 3/4/2024 HON ANDREW RORABACK | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/19/2024 HON ANDREW RORABACK | |
January 19, 2024 | Remote Pretrial Conference | ||
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 1/19/2024 HON ANDREW RORABACK | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 10/19/2023 HON ANDREW RORABACK | |
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 9/28/2023 HON ANDREW RORABACK | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 8/18/2023 HON ANDREW RORABACK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.