Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Pagaya Funding Trust Ii, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mark Sank & Associates Llc, against Joel Quezada, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts LITCHFIELD JD.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2023 |
CategoryC40 - Contracts - Collections |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseLITCHFIELD JD |
NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: October 25, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/19/2023 HON WALTER MENJIVAR
Date: October 19, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2023SUMMONS
Date: March 22, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/19/2023 HON WALTER MENJIVAR | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL-PRACTICE BOOK SECTION 17-23 ET SEQ RESULT: HON WALTER MENJIVAR | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO APPEAR AND JUDGMENT WITH ORDER OF PAYMENTS PB SECTION 17-23 RESULT: Granted 10/19/2023 HON WALTER MENJIVAR | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.