Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Absolute Resolutions Investments, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cohen Burns Hard & Paul, against Diletta Divita-Squires, represented by 9 Dartmouth St, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts LITCHFIELD JD.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2023 |
CategoryS15 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Collection - Purchase Debt |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseLITCHFIELD JD |
EXHIBITS
Date: March 21, 2023MOTION TO MODIFY ORDER OF PAYMENTS - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: June 29, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/26/2023 MARK LEE, MAG
Date: May 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: March 21, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 9/22/2023 MARK LEE, MAG
Date: September 22, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 7/14/2023 MARK LEE, MAG
Date: July 14, 2023MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 21, 2023SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: March 21, 2023SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40
Date: March 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 9/22/2023 MARK LEE, MAG | |
September 22, 2023 | Remote Hearing | ||
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 7/14/2023 MARK LEE, MAG | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO MODIFY ORDER OF PAYMENTS - SMALL CLAIMS | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/26/2023 MARK LEE, MAG | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL FOR PLAINTIFF RESULT: MARK LEE, MAG | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.