Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Mainline Property Rentals Llc, filed a(n) H00 - Housing - Summary Process case represented by The Law Office Of Yona Gregory, The Law Office Of Yona Gregory Llc, against Constance Chatfield, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts LITCHFIELD JD with Jason M. Lobo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason M. Lobo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryH00 - Housing - Summary Process |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
|
Filing Court HouseLITCHFIELD JD |
NOTICE
Date: April 18, 2023EXECUTION RETURNED SATISFIED
Date: May 26, 2023SUMMARY PROCESS EXECUTION FILED
Date: April 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | EXECUTION RETURNED SATISFIED | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION ISSUED SUMMARY PROCESS Last Updated: Entry Number - 04/28/2023 | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMARY PROCESS EXECUTION FILED | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/18/2023 HON JASON LOBO | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION - NON PAYMENT OF RENT RESULT: HON JASON LOBO | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT CARES ACT Affidavit of Compliance | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION SUMMARY PROCESS | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER Needs Cares Act Aff RESULT: Order 3/27/2023 BY THE CLERK | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.