Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Jay Sullivan, Lesley Sullivan, filed a(n) H00 - Housing - Summary Process case represented by The Law Office Of Yona Gregory, The Law Office Of Yona Gregory Llc, against Amber Mohangel, represented by Gregory Scott Jones, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts LITCHFIELD JD with Jason M. Lobo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason M. Lobo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryH00 - Housing - Summary Process |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
|
Filing Court HouseLITCHFIELD JD |
RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 20, 2023MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF DEFAULT FOR FAILURE TO PLEAD AND POSSESSION SUMMARY PROCESS
Date: April 25, 2023STIPULATION RESULT: Accepted 5/16/2023 HON JASON LOBO
Date: May 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH STIPULATION - SUMMARY PROCESS | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION RESULT: Accepted 5/16/2023 HON JASON LOBO | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Accepted 5/16/2023 HON JASON LOBO | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF WITH FINAL STAY BY STIPULATION RESULT: HON JASON LOBO | |
May 16, 2023 | Trial | ||
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF DEFAULT FOR FAILURE TO PLEAD AND POSSESSION SUMMARY PROCESS | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT CARES ACT Affidavit of Compliance | |
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.