Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Schreiber Law Llc, against Kirsten Pietrafesa, represented by Apt 43, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts LITCHFIELD JD.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryS15 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Collection - Purchase Debt |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseLITCHFIELD JD |
ORDER RESULT: Order 10/27/2023 MARK LEE, MAG
Date: October 27, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 8/11/2023 MARK LEE, MAG
Date: August 11, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 5/26/2023 MARK LEE, MAG
Date: May 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 10/27/2023 MARK LEE, MAG | |
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL RESULT: MARK LEE, MAG | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 8/11/2023 MARK LEE, MAG | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 5/26/2023 MARK LEE, MAG | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF NOTICE | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.