Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Owner Trustee For Rcf 2 Acquisition Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Glass & Braus Llc, against Bank Of America, Na, Kim R. Griffen, Scott M. Bouley, represented by 53 Bantam Terrace, Korde & Associates P.C., in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts LITCHFIELD JD with Andrew W. Roraback presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrew W. Roraback Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryP00 - Property - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseLITCHFIELD JD |
NOTICE CERTIFIED NOTICE OF JUDGMENT TO NON-APPEARING OWNER(S) OF EQUITY
Date: June 16, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 10/24/2023 HON ANDREW RORABACK
Date: October 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 2/15/2024 HON WALTER MENJIVAR | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT RESULT: HON WALTER MENJIVAR | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | REPLACE RECORD TO PLEADING STATUS (KEYPOINT 2) AND ERASE ALL HIGHER KEYPOINT DATES | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT AMENDED MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT RESULT: Order 2/15/2024 HON WALTER MENJIVAR | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Denied 12/20/2023 HON WALTER MENJIVAR | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SALE - WITH PROCEEDS | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT Motion for partial supplemental judgment RESULT: Denied 12/20/2023 HON WALTER MENJIVAR | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | COMMITTEE DEED | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 10/24/2023 HON ANDREW RORABACK | |
October 23, 2023 | Short Calendar SC-02 #014 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.