Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Maggie Wroe, Silas Emil Levine, against Katharine A Thurlow, represented by 29 Buckingham Rd, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 16, 2023 |
CategoryS15 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Collection - Purchase Debt |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: November 06, 2023ORDER RESULT: Accepted 5/26/2023 MARK LEE, MAG
Date: May 26, 2023ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: March 23, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: March 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: March 16, 2023STIPULATION - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: May 26, 2023SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40
Date: March 16, 2023MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 16, 2023SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: March 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Accepted 5/26/2023 MARK LEE, MAG | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SMALL CLAIMS | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION BEFORE TRIAL COMMENCED RESULT: MARK LEE, MAG | |
May 26, 2023 | Remote Court Trial | ||
May 26, 2023 | Remote Settlement Conference | ||
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.