Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Norman Deangelis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kennedy Johnson Schwab & Roberge Llc, Lettick & Lettick Pc, against Jacqueline C Lyons, William E Avery Iii, represented by Law Offices Of Dennis J Rinaldi, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with Ann E. Lynch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnn E. Lynch Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2023 |
CategoryV01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is regarding a car accident that occurred on East Main Street in Torrington, Connecticut. The plaintiff, Norman DeAngelis, was driving a truck owned by Barnwell of Connecticut, LLC, while the defendant, Jacqueline C. Lyons, was driving...
WITHDRAWAL OF INTERVENING COMPLAINT contingent upon receipt of lien reimbursement
Date: January 22, 2024APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 12, 2024 | Remote Trial Management Conference | ||
August 15, 2024 | Remote Status Conference | ||
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF INTERVENING COMPLAINT contingent upon receipt of lien reimbursement | |
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION RESULT: BY THE PLAINTIFF | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ACCEPTANCE OF OFFER OF COMPROMISE | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | OFFER OF COMPROMISE Offer of Compromise by Plaintiff | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/23/2023 HON ANN LYNCH | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Compliance with Interrogatories and Request for Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.