Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Newrez Llc D B A Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Korde & Associates P.C., against Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, Stephen Macdonald, represented by 253 Circle Drive, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2023 |
CategoryP00 - Property - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
APPEARANCE S. MACDONALD
Date: March 30, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 15, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2023 | Remote Mediation | ||
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE MEDIATOR'S FINAL REPORT - MEDIATION PERIOD TERMINATED | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION RESULT: BY THE PLAINTIFF | |
September 25, 2023 | Remote Mediation | ||
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE MEDIATOR’S PREMEDIATION REPORT | |
June 05, 2023 | Remote Premediation | ||
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE S. MACDONALD | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER Mediation to be scheduled. RESULT: Order 3/30/2023 BY THE CLERK | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE MEDIATION REQUEST/CERTIFICATE JD-CV-108 RESULT: Order 3/30/2023 BY THE CLERK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.