Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Capital One, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by London & London, against Alejandro Tabares, represented by 40 Killawee St Apt B11, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 10, 2023 |
CategoryS00 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Collection - Credit Card (Original Owner) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40
Date: March 10, 2023WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION
Date: May 24, 2023ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: April 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2023 | Remote Hearing | ||
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION RESULT: BY THE CLERK | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40 | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.