Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Brenda Aurelia Trustee, filed a(n) H00 - Housing - Summary Process case represented by Peter N Buzaid, against Roger Standt, represented by 31 Lanesville Rd, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with Jason M. Lobo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason M. Lobo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2023 |
CategoryH00 - Housing - Summary Process |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
|
ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: March 24, 2023EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION ISSUED SUMMARY PROCESS
Date: April 27, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 4/18/2023 HON JASON LOBO
Date: April 18, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 10, 2023NOTICE TO QUIT POSSESSION - ORIGINAL SUMMARY PROCESS
Date: March 10, 2023SUMMARY PROCESS EXECUTION FILED
Date: April 25, 2023NOTICE
Date: April 18, 2023REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: March 27, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 10, 2023HOUSING SUMMARY PROCESS SUMMONS (JD-HM-32)
Date: March 10, 2023APPEARANCE R. STANDT
Date: March 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION ISSUED SUMMARY PROCESS | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMARY PROCESS EXECUTION FILED | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 4/18/2023 HON JASON LOBO | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION - WHERE ONE ORIGINALLY HAD THE RIGHT OR PRIVILEGE IS NOW TERMINATED RESULT: HON JASON LOBO | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE R. STANDT | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO QUIT POSSESSION - ORIGINAL SUMMARY PROCESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.