Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Naomi Lancaster, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ganim Ganim Ganim & Ganim Pc, against Bus Equity, Llc, Thomas Raymond Fildes, represented by Aeton Law Partners Llp, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts with Thomas J. Welch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas J. Welch Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 07, 2022 |
CategoryV01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
COMPLAINT
Date: October 07, 2022SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN
Date: October 07, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 07, 2022SUMMONS
Date: October 07, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: October 20, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 11/7/2022 HON THOMAS WELCH
Date: October 20, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/7/2022 HON THOMAS WELCH
Date: November 07, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY
Date: October 20, 2022NOTICE Plaintiff's Notice of Service of Interrogatories and Production on the Defendant Fildes
Date: November 14, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE DISCOVERY MOTION OR REQUEST PB CH13
Date: January 27, 2023SUGGESTION OF DEATH
Date: January 11, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 1/23/2023 HON THOMAS WELCH
Date: January 11, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/23/2023 HON THOMAS WELCH
Date: January 23, 2023OBJECTION TO MOTION to Defendant's Motion for Order of Compliance
Date: June 08, 2023MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9)
Date: June 08, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Denied 7/24/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: June 08, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Interrogatories 205, 217
Date: June 08, 2023WITHDRAWAL IN PART
Date: June 09, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE DISCOVERY MOTION OR REQUEST PB CH13
Date: March 22, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD
Date: June 08, 2023REQUEST TO REVISE
Date: June 14, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 6/12/2023 HON THOMAS WELCH
Date: June 12, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RESULT: Granted 7/24/2023 HON THOMAS WELCH
Date: July 11, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/24/2023 HON THOMAS WELCH
Date: July 24, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 7/24/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: July 24, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER BY AGREEMENT C50,T02,T03,T11,T12,T61,V01,V04, V09 CASES
Date: July 13, 2023OBJECTION TO MOTION
Date: September 12, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: September 12, 2023REVISED COMPLAINT
Date: July 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
June 11, 2024 | Pretrial Conference | ||
September 25, 2023 | Short Calendar SC-14 #024 | ||
September 18, 2023 | Short Calendar SC-14 #022 | ||
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO MOTION | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | REVISED COMPLAINT | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/24/2023 HON THOMAS WELCH | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Denied 7/24/2023 BY THE CLERK | |
July 24, 2023 | Short Calendar SC-14 #026 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.