Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Felicia Mccree, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by The Flood Law Firm Llc, against Jason Ross, Marcos Edwards, Stew Leonard'S, A Connecticut General Partnership, Stlj Llc, represented by 104 Silver Creek Ln., Connelly Christopher M Law Office Of, Gerber Ciano Kelly Brady Llp, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Thomas J. Welch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas J. Welch Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2022 |
CategoryT50 - Torts - Defamation |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
MOTION FOR NONSUIT FOR FAILURE TO PLEAD
Date: November 17, 2022LIST OF EXHIBITS (JD-CL-28/JD-CL-28a)
Date: March 15, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
March 20, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES/PRODUCTION PB 13-8 and 13-10 Defs' Objections to Plf's 2nd Set of IRP | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION of #175.00, Defs' Notice of Compliance | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | LIST OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF THE LIVE TESTIMONY OF AN EXPERT WITNESS supplemental | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS supplemental | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | LIST OF EXHIBITS (JD-CL-28/JD-CL-28a) | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE (Stew Leonard's Policy & Procedures) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.