Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Donald Billingham, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Miller Rosnick D'Amico August & Butler P, against Bryan Clark, Mariusz D Grochola, represented by Karen Ondrovic, Meehan Di Palma Roberts & Turret Law Off, Nicholas Law Firm Llc, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts with Theodore R. Tyma presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTheodore R. Tyma Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2022 |
CategoryV01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint alleges negligence and statutory recklessness against two defendants, Mariusz D. Grochola and Bryan Clark. The incident occurred on May 3, 2022, on Route 15 northbound in Trumbull, Connecticut. The plaintiff, Donald Billingham, was dri...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2023 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
November 07, 2023 | Pretrial Conference | ||
October 10, 2023 | Withdrawal Due | ||
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
September 07, 2023 | Remote Pretrial Conference | ||
August 07, 2023 | Short Calendar SC-12 #003 | ||
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/2/2023 HON JENNIFER DECASTRO-TUNNARD | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 8/2/2023 HON JENNIFER DECASTRO-TUNNARD | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Compliance for Defendant's Motion for Order of Compliance | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Denied 7/24/2023 HON JENNIFER DECASTRO-TUNNARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.