Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
William Harrington, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by The Flood Law Firm Llc, against Antoinette Violi Conservator Of The Estate Of Larry Campbell, John Spencer Conservator Of The Estate Of Larry Campbell, Larry Campbell, represented by Garraty Cynthia M. Law Offices, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Kenneth B. Povodator presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth B. Povodator Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2022 |
CategoryT02 - Torts - Defective Premises - Private - Snow Or Ice |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE to second amended complaint
Date: January 25, 2023MOTION TO DISMISS PB 10-30 & Memo in Support
Date: September 23, 2022NOTICE Notice of Amended Complaint
Date: December 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
April 24, 2024 | Remote Status Conference | ||
April 10, 2024 | Remote Status Conference | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | LIST OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF THE LIVE TESTIMONY OF AN EXPERT WITNESS Supplemental | |
March 28, 2024 | Remote Status Conference | ||
March 22, 2024 | Remote Status Conference | ||
March 15, 2024 | Remote Status Conference | ||
February 05, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-14 #039 | ||
February 01, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 1/25/2024 HON JOHN RILEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.