Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Michael Scott, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jonathan Eamon Spodnick, against Saeed Iqbal, represented by Law Offices Of Dennis J Rinaldi, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts with Thomas J. Welch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas J. Welch Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2022 |
CategoryV01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: March 02, 2022SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN
Date: March 08, 2022SUMMONS
Date: February 15, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: March 02, 2022NOTICE NOTICE OF INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: March 08, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: February 15, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 15, 2022NOTICE Notice of Defendant's Request for Disclosure & Production
Date: March 02, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/23/2022 HON THOMAS WELCH
Date: May 23, 2022CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: May 24, 2022REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: May 20, 2022ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: May 13, 2022MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RESULT: Granted 5/23/2022 HON THOMAS WELCH
Date: May 09, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/2/2022 HON THEODORE TYMA
Date: May 02, 2022MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9)
Date: January 27, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/20/2022 HON THOMAS WELCH
Date: June 20, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/14/2023 HON THOMAS WELCH
Date: February 14, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER BY AGREEMENT C50,T02,T03,T11,T12,T61,V01,V04, V09 CASES
Date: December 23, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: March 24, 2023WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION
Date: August 04, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RESULT: Granted 2/14/2023 HON THOMAS WELCH
Date: January 30, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: August 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2023 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
November 02, 2023 | Pretrial Conference | ||
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/14/2023 HON THOMAS WELCH | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RESULT: Granted 2/14/2023 HON THOMAS WELCH | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9) | |
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER BY AGREEMENT C50,T02,T03,T11,T12,T61,V01,V04, V09 CASES | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/20/2022 HON THOMAS WELCH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.