Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
David A. Jones Jr, filed a(n) case represented by 42 Peaceable St., against Stephanie Langyel, represented by 200 Dogwood Ln., in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts with HON CARLA NASCIMENTO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON CARLA NASCIMENTO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL UNDER PB 14-3 NOTICES SENT - COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL ONLY RESULT: HON CARLA NASCIMENTO | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 5/25/2022 HON CARLA NASCIMENTO | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF RESOLUTION SCREENING (FORM JD-FM-290) | |
May 25, 2022 | Resolution Plan Date | ||
April 20, 2022 | Resolution Plan Date | ||
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 4/13/2022 HON HEIDI WINSLOW | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Order 4/13/2022 HON HEIDI WINSLOW | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Denied 4/12/2022 HON MAXIMINO MEDINA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.