Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
C W Brower Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Velleca, Keith M, Esq., against Daniel, Remon, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Mayhew, William A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMayhew, William A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 13, 2017 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Request for Dismissal - Party Only
Date: May 07, 2018Civil Complaint
Date: April 13, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: August 02, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Silveira, Marie Sovey |
|
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Party Only | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons - Substituted Service | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Invoice - Fiscal | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Mintue Order- Case Management Conference Case Management Conference |
|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT - CONTRACT Civil Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.