Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Valencia, Lourdes, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Freiman Law, against Pleasanton Fitness Llc, represented by Newman &Amp; Broomand Llp, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Speiller, Stacy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSpeiller, Stacy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2016 |
CategoryWrongful Termination: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Management Conference Statement
Date: August 17, 2017Answer
Date: March 28, 2017Request for Dismissal - Entire Action
Date: September 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court's Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal - Party Only Request for Dismissal - Partial |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court's Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment/Order | |
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.