Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Colby, Jonathen David, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Colby, Marci Dian, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Cassidy, Alan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCassidy, Alan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management190 days |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions693 days |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Child Custody Evaluation Report | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Initiated Econ MO Hrg | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order - Telephonic Economic | |
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Child Custody Evaluator | |
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.