Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Miller, Kenneth Rea, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Miller, Brittany Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Israels, Valli presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsraels, Valli Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Assessment Worksheet | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Distaso, Joseph Richard |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Distaso, Joseph Richard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.