Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Roper, Kristin Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Roper, John William, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Cassidy, Alan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCassidy, Alan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 19, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
July 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Fees Mediation/Sanctions | |
July 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Accounts Receivable- Fiscal | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause: CMC | |
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | 1st Appearance Fees- Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.