Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dickey, Diane Lynn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dickey, Aaron Sherman, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Westbrook, Kellee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWestbrook, Kellee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2019 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | FOAH | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Temporary Emergency Orders- Granted | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Order- FL-300 | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Order Filed | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed | |
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.