Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bandala, Maria Delpilar, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Illescas, Rony, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Westbrook, Robert B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWestbrook, Robert B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Dismissed/Lack of Prosecution | |
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Disclosure Svc Declaration Filed | |
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Response | |
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.