Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Carl W Denyer, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Melana Renee Denyer, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJacobson, Jack M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Petitioner's 191 Filed | |
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Granted | |
July 29, 2016 | Hearing | Case Management Conference | |
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.