Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hernandez, Arturo, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rodriguez, Gabriela Avila, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJacobson, Jack M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management1285 days |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedMay 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1411 days |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1411 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Modification
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Decl Regarding Address Verification | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration (Petitioner) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.