Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jennings, Dwight H., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jennings, Shirley R, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Begen, Loretta Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBegen, Loretta Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2014 |
CategoryLegal Separation Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Order Filed | |
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Disclosure Svc Declaration Filed | |
May 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Order Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.