Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hodge, Aunrae K, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hodge, Angela L, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Begen, Loretta Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBegen, Loretta Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Fees Mediation/Sanctions | |
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
September 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Disclosure Svc Declaration Filed | |
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.