Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brown, Tracy Jamar, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Almaras, Misty Jean, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Begen, Loretta Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBegen, Loretta Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
February 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Dismissed/Lack of Prosecution | |
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause: CMC | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
November 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Granted | |
November 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Disclosure Svc Declaration Filed | |
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause: CMC | |
August 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.