Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Conley, Brandi Nicole, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Mccockran, Lewis Eugene, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJacobson, Jack M Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2012 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Petition For Custody And Support |
Time To Trial2885 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Under Submission
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Denied | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Assessment Worksheet | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Requested | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Refer Fam Court Svcs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.