Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chavez, Pedro, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Chavez, Raquel, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Westbrook, Kellee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWestbrook, Kellee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Order Filed | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Order Filed | |
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.