Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gogri, Mahesh, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Struck Firm, against Wesley, Arlee, Walker, Nakiya, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Salter, Timothy W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSalter, Timothy W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued | |
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event | UD Court Judgment | |
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Court Trial After Evidence | |
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice Of Trial | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.