Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Stacey, Sylvetta Sue, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Dennis, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2013 |
CategoryCivil Harassment: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Court Trial Before Evidence | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Dismissed/Lack of Prosecution | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Denied | |
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.