Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tabalonjohnson, Dalee, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Yates, Chad Bion, Esq., against Tabalon, Tracy Marie, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Salter, Timothy W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSalter, Timothy W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2012 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - Full | |
July 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued | |
July 02, 2012 | Docket Event | UD Court Judgment | |
July 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Court Trial After Evidence | |
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
June 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
June 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Court Trial After Evidence |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.