Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lugli, Russell, Rose Garden Apartments, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Rowe, Anthony Drew, Esq., against Cheadle, Susan, Cheadle, Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Salter, Timothy W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSalter, Timothy W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2012 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
February 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued | |
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event | UD Court Judgment | |
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Court Trial Before Evidence | |
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice Of Trial | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.