Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rawe, Ronald George, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pallios, Pacher - Silva, against Howell, Dennis Lee, Fischer Ii, Russell Theodore, represented by Austin Brownwood - Cannon, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Salter, Timothy W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSalter, Timothy W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 02, 2012 |
CategoryAuto Tort: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
October 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
October 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Answer | |
April 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
December 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Civil Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.